EP3922907 - LIGHTING APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortem S.p.A. Via Aquileia, 10 34070 Villesse / IT | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gratton, Riccardo 34151 Trieste (TS) / IT | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 21178637.1 | 09.06.2021 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | IT20200014008 | 11.06.2020 Original published format: IT202000014008 | [2021/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922907 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3922907 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21S4/20, F21V25/12, F21V15/01, F21V31/00, // F21V3/06, F21Y103/10, F21Y115/10 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
F21V25/12 (EP);
F21S4/20 (EP);
F21V15/013 (EP);
F21V31/005 (EP);
F21V3/0625 (EP);
F21Y2103/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/50] | English: | LIGHTING APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD | [2021/50] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 30.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2262157 (BEALS GILLSON W) [X] 1-3,5,8-12 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,6,7,13; | [IA]KR100986716B (STARNET CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-3,5,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 4,6,7,13; | [XAI]US8033677 (OLSSON MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,11,12 * column 5, lines 1-32; figure 6A * * column 6, lines 45-48; figure 14 * [A] 2-4,6-8,13 [I] 10; | [X]CN202521452U (SICHUAN HUATAI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2017261193 (TREIBLE JR DANIEL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0066]; figures 1-12 * | by applicant | KR100986716B | US8033677 |