EP3923219 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A GAS QUANTITY DELIVERED TO A VEHICLE AT A HYDROGEN DELIVERY POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westenergie AG Opernplatz 1 45128 Essen / DE | [2022/24] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states Westenergie AG Kruppstraße 5 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaul, Armin 59379 Selm / DE | 02 /
Kledewski, Ingo 44319 Dortmund / DE | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 21178819.5 | 10.06.2021 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | DE202010115644 | 12.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020115644 | [2021/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923219 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/20, G06Q20/40, G07F9/00, G07F13/02, G07F15/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G07F15/001 (EP);
G06Q20/206 (EP);
G06Q20/208 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP);
G07F13/025 (EP);
G07F9/001 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINER AN EIN FAHRZEUG ABGEGEBENEN GASMENGE EINES WASSERSTOFFS BEI EINER WASSERSTOFFTANKSTELLE | [2021/50] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A GAS QUANTITY DELIVERED TO A VEHICLE AT A HYDROGEN DELIVERY POINT | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE QUANTITÉ DE GAZ HYDROGÈNE DISTRIBUÉE À UN VÉHICULE À UNE STATION-SERVICE EN HYDROGÈNE | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011044543 (PAUL LEVY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0070] *; | [XI]WO2011101783 (PATTERSON GORDON IAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] , [0056] - [0063] * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [A]DE102011113354 (RWE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0116] - [0153] *; | [A]US2013246171 (CARAPELLI GIOVANNI [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] - [0063] *; | [A]US10504094 (GAUDIN KRISTOPHER KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 23, line 66 - column 38, line 57 *; | [XI]US2020013039 (SNODGRASS ANDREW R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0044] - [0059] * [I] 3-12,14,15 |