EP4104966 - CLAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofer Spanntechnik GmbH Limmatauweg 18b 5408 Ennetbaden / CH | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFER, Guido 5408 Ennetbaden / CH | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21179190.0 | 14.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104966 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0063 (EP);
B23Q1/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFSPANNVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4015445 (WERKZEUGMASCH HECKERT VEB [DE]) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 7; figures 1, 2 *; | [XDA]EP2774717 (3R SYST INT AB [SE]) [XD] 12 * figures 1a, 1b, 6a, 6b * [A] 1-11 | by applicant | EP2774717 |