EP3964183 - OCULAR DELIVERY SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sight Sciences, Inc. 3000 Sand Hill Road Building 3, Suite 105 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADAWI, David, Y. Glenview, 60025 / US | 02 /
O'KEEFFE, Daniel San Francisco, 94123 / US | 03 /
BADAWI, Paul Menlo Park, 94025 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 21179625.5 | 31.03.2015 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964183 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A61F9/00781 (EP);
A61F9/0017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR OKULAREN FREISETZUNG | [2022/10] | English: | OCULAR DELIVERY SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FOURNITURE OCULAIRE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 09.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15888007.0 / EP3277236 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011098809 (WARDLE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2013253402 (BADAWI DAVID Y [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0064] , [0 82] - [0091]; figure 4a *; | [A]US8568391 (KERNS RALPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014213958 (CLAUSON LUKE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0067]; figures 9a,9b,9v * | by applicant | US7909789 | US8529622 |