EP4105099 - MONITORING THE ELECTRICAL SIGNAL BETWEEN AN ETCS LINESIDE ELECTRICAL UNIT AND ITS TRACKSIDE BALISE IN A RAILWAY ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ertms Solutions Rue de la Caserne 45 1000 Bruxelles / BE | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDES, Emmanuel Bruxelles / BE | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 21179687.5 | 16.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105099 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/12, B61L27/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B61L3/12 (EP,KR);
B61L27/53 (EP,KR);
B61L2027/202 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DES ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALS ZWISCHEN EINER STRECKENSEITIGEN ELEKTRISCHEN ETCS-EINHEIT UND DEREN STRECKENSEITIGEN BALISE DAFÜR IN EINER EISENBAHNUMGEBUNG | [2022/51] | English: | MONITORING THE ELECTRICAL SIGNAL BETWEEN AN ETCS LINESIDE ELECTRICAL UNIT AND ITS TRACKSIDE BALISE IN A RAILWAY ENVIRONMENT | [2022/51] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DU SIGNAL ÉLECTRIQUE ENTRE UNE UNITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE ETCS CÔTÉ LIGNE ET SA BALISE CÔTÉ VOIE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE CHEMIN DE FER | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19708518 (SIGNAL CONCEPT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1 and 2; column 3, line 39 - column 6, line 41 *; | [A]EP2186706 (ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 1-15* figures 1 - 3; paragraphs [0017] - [0034] *; | [A]CN108132433B (BEIJING NAT RAILWAY RES & DESIGN INST SIGNAL & COMMUNICATION LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 2 - 5; and corresponding parts of the description * | by applicant | EP3067246 |