EP3930152 - ROTOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akin, Meriem 30159 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Schade, Michael 34132 Kassel / DE | 03 /
Dolle, Florian 34255 Altenritte / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21179894.7 | 16.06.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | DE202010207781 | 23.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020207781 | [2021/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930152 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930152 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/276, H02K15/03 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H02K1/2766 (EP,CN);
H02K15/03 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2021/52] | English: | ROTOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2021/52] | French: | ROTOR POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | [2024/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005206270 (AISENBREY THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]DE60317028T (MOLD MASTERS 2007 LTD [CA]) [Y] 9* paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2011239607 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * |