Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
12.08.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.12.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
18.06.2021 | Change - representative |