02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
17.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
29.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
09.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
02.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
12.01.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
26.09.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.04.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
02.04.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
24.12.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|