Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11631718 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B2 | US2022020818 | 20.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200089858 | 20.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220011005 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200089858 | 20.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113964131 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200089858 | 20.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3944326 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | B1 | EP3944326 | 26.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200089858 | 20.07.2020 |