EP3971676 - BUILDING SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACO Ahlmann SE & Co. KG Am Ahlmannkai 24782 Büdelsdorf / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luttmer, Jörg 24306 Oberkleveez / DE | 02 /
Trippel, Stefan 24363 Holtsee / DE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Kilchert, Jochen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21180909.0 | 22.06.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | DE202010116651 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020116651 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971676 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, G05D22/02 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G05D22/02 (EP);
G05D23/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBÄUDESCHUTZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2022/12] | English: | BUILDING SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DU BÂTIMENT | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0428240 (SCHOETTLER LUNOS LUEFTUNG [DE]); | [XYI]WO2011136713 (DRYVENT SOLUTIONS OF SCANDINAVIA AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US2015032264 (EMMONS DAVID J [US], et al) |