EP4108496 - BIDIRECTIONAL POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR POWERING A BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flatscher, Matthias 8020 Graz / AT | 02 /
Kurcik, Peter 8505 St. Nikolai im Sausal / AT | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21180915.7 | 22.06.2021 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108496 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L58/20, B60L1/12, H02M3/335, H02J9/06, H01M10/42, H02J1/08 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B60L3/0084 (EP);
B60L58/20 (EP,KR);
B60L1/12 (EP);
B60L3/0092 (EP);
B60L50/60 (KR);
B60R16/033 (KR);
H02J7/345 (EP);
H02M1/0006 (EP);
H02M1/10 (EP);
H02M3/33584 (EP);
B60L2210/10 (KR);
B60L2210/12 (EP);
B60L2210/14 (EP);
B60L2260/00 (KR);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2306/15 (KR);
B60Y2400/112 (KR);
H02J2207/10 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (EP);
H02J2207/50 (EP);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
H02M1/0009 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M1/325 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALES STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM ZUR SPEISUNG EINES BATTERIEMANAGEMENTSYSTEMS EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FAHRZEUGS | [2022/52] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR POWERING A BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2022/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION BIDIRECTIONNELLE POUR ALIMENTER UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE D'UN VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104827921 (BEIQI FOTON MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US2018186241 (HARVEY ARTHUR JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018153679 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XYI]US2018334118 (MASUI HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2019190294 (SATO YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]EP3722137 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020335991 (TSUKAMOTO HIROAKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP1801960 |