EP3929408 - IMPROVED ROTATING BEARING CENTERING SPRING FOR A GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Todd A. Tolland, 06084 / US | 02 /
HANRAHAN, Paul R. Farmington, 06032-3425 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21181450.4 | 24.06.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | US202016913019 | 26.06.2020 Original published format: US202016913019 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929408 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3929408 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/16, F01D25/04, F01D25/24 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
F01D25/164 (EP,US);
F16C27/04 (US);
F01D25/04 (EP);
F01D25/243 (EP);
F16C35/077 (US);
F05D2240/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE DREHLAGERZENTRIERFEDER FÜR EINE GASTURBINE | [2023/23] | English: | IMPROVED ROTATING BEARING CENTERING SPRING FOR A GAS TURBINE | [2021/52] | French: | RESSORT ROTATIF DE CENTRAGE DE PALIER AMELIORÉ POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/52] | VERBESSERTER DREHLAGERZENTRIERFEDER FÜR EINE GASTURBINE | ||
Former [2021/52] | RESSORT DE CENTRAGE DE PALIER AMELIORÉ POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2672818 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, paragraphs 2,3; figures 1, 2,3 *; | [X]US10001028 (GANIGER RAVINDRA SHANKAR [IN], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US10138757 (WITLICKI RUSSELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-11* figures 2,3,5 * |