EP4108716 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING CARBON FIBER-FILLED SEMI-CRYSTALLINE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHPP Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINHA, Reema Bangalore / IN | 02 /
YANG, Jian Shanghai / CN | 03 /
WAN, Xingqiu Shanghai / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21181548.5 | 24.06.2021 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108716 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08K5/00, C08K5/098, C08K7/06, C08L77/02, C08L67/02 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C08K5/0083 (EP);
C08K3/346 (EP);
C08K5/098 (EP);
C08K7/06 (EP);
C08K2201/003 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L77/02 (EP);
C08K7/06, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K7/06, C08L77/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KOHLENSTOFFFASERGEFÜLLTEN HALBKRISTALLINEN POLYMEREN | [2022/52] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING CARBON FIBER-FILLED SEMI-CRYSTALLINE POLYMERS | [2022/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICES COMPRENANT DES POLYMÈRES SEMI-CRISTALLINS CHARGÉS DE FIBRES DE CARBONE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20120016870 (SUNGHO POLYTECH [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [XA]US2013119320 (SUYAMA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * examples 1,6,7 * [A] 3; | [X]JP5458846B (UBE INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0047]; example - *; | [X]US10017630 (SHIMIZU HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2019127573 (SU CHEAN-CHENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2019292366 (BIENMUELLER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * page 17; example 1 * |