EP4108390 - METHOD FOR SECURE OPERATION OF A MOVABLE MACHINE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Christoph 20535 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schubert, Lars 24119 Kronshagen / DE | 03 /
Plitzkow, Jan 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 04 /
Winter, Jonas 23896 Nusse / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21181648.3 | 25.06.2021 | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108390 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4108390 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B25J9/1676 (EP);
G05B2219/37425 (EP);
G05B2219/39085 (EP);
G05B2219/40442 (EP);
G05B2219/40548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SICHEREN BETRIEB EINES BEWEGLICHEN MASCHINENTEILS | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURE OPERATION OF A MOVABLE MACHINE PART | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT SÉCURISÉ D'UNE PIÈCE DE MACHINE MOBILE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 27.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9211643 (SHIRAKYAN GRIGOR [US], et al) [A] 1,4,13 * abstract ** column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 34 *; | [A]US2017144307 (RUBLEE ETHAN [US], et al) [A] 1,5-10,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] *; | [A]DE102016212694 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2018005986 (BRAIN CORP [US]) [I] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]DE102018118265 (SICK AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0027] * * abstract * * figure - * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046] * [I] 4-10; | [A] - TIAN YAFU ET AL, "A fast incremental map segmentation algorithm based on spectral clustering and quadtree", ADVANCES IN MECHANICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1177/1687814018761296, ISSN 1687-8140, (20180201), URL: https://journals.sagepub.com/doi/pdf/10.1177/1687814018761296, (20211123), XP055864982 [A] 1,5-10,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1687814018761296 |