EP3978387 - CLOSURE ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTAINER AND CONTAINER HAVING A CLOSURE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINGUITI, Martina 41019 Soliera / IT | 02 /
SORBARA, Angelo 42048 Rubiera / IT | 03 /
CANI, Franco 41124 Modena / IT | 04 /
VIANI, Tiziano 42021 Bibbiano / IT | 05 /
GORI, Luca 40134 Bologna / IT | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 21181938.8 | 28.06.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | EP20200200060 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20200060 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978387 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3978387 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34, B65D55/16 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B65D41/3447 (EP,US);
B65D55/16 (EP,US);
B65D41/50 (EP,US);
B65D47/2012 (US);
B65D51/226 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSANORDNUNG FÜR BEHÄLTER UND BEHÄLTER MIT VERSCHLUSSANORDNUNG | [2022/51] | English: | CLOSURE ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTAINER AND CONTAINER HAVING A CLOSURE ASSEMBLY | [2022/14] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE FERMETURE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT ET RÉCIPIENT DOTÉ D'UN ENSEMBLE DE FERMETURE | [2022/14] |
Former [2022/14] | VERSCHLUSSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER UND BEHÄLTER MIT EINER VERSCHLUSSANORDNUNG | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 06.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22207150.8 / EP4166472 | EP22207151.6 / EP4166473 | EP24162847.8 / EP4375209 | EP24183952.1 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 28.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008056246 (CROWN CORK JAPAN); | [X]JP2010083488 (CROWN CORK JAPAN); | [X]JP2013230822 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [X]EP3670377 (BETAPACK S A U [ES]) |