EP3961457 - DATA CHECK METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alipay (Hangzhou) Information Technology Co., Ltd. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor, Section B Suite 801-11 West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Renhui Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xinmin Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Yuan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Wenyu Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 05 /
QIAN, Feng Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 06 /
GUO, Qianting Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 07 /
LI, Shubo Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21181988.3 | 28.06.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | CN202010900858 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010900858 | [2022/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961457 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, H04L9/32, G06F21/53, G06F21/31, G06F21/64, G06Q20/02, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40, H04L9/40, H04L9/08, H04L9/00 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/602 (CN,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/38215 (EP);
G06Q20/401 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/0428 (CN,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/123 (CN);
H04L63/126 (EP,CN);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
H04L9/3236 (EP);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,CN,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP);
G06Q20/389 (US);
G06Q2220/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06F21/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERPRÜFUNGSVERFAHREN, -EINRICHTUNGEN UND -VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | DATA CHECK METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND DEVICES | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET DISPOSITIFS DE VÉRIFICATION DE DONNÉES | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN111147432 (FUBON FINANCIAL HOLDING CO LTD, et al); |