EP4112250 - HAIR CUTTING KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASCHINSKI, Gerd 61476 Kronberg / DE | 02 /
SCHÜSSLER, Markus 61476 Kronberg / DE | 03 /
LANGWASSER, Simone 61476 Kronberg / DE | 04 /
KRAUSS, Joachim 61476 Kronberg / DE | 05 /
SIKORA, Bernhard 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21182060.0 | 28.06.2021 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112250 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/20 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B26B19/20 (EP);
B26B19/3846 (US);
B26B19/3813 (US);
B26B19/3853 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARSCHNEIDEKIT | [2023/01] | English: | HAIR CUTTING KIT | [2023/01] | French: | KIT DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 02.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 02.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1546912 (BEAUCHAMP VIRGIL L) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-7 *; | [XAY]US4614036 (HARAGUCHI HIDEAKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,12-16 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-4, 6 * [A] 2,4,10,11 [Y] 6; | [Y]US5050305 (BAKER RICHARD I [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 2; figures 1, 4, 7 *; | [A]WO2017084897 (BABYLISS FACO SPRL [BE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figures 3, 6-9 * |