EP3909465 - LIGHT WEIGHT MODULAR POUCH ATTACHMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FirstSpear, LLC 2015 Corporate 44 Drive Fenton, MO 63026 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Michael E. Ste. Genevieve, 63670 / US | 02 /
CARVER, Scott, J. Chesterfield, 63017 / US | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Lambacher, Michael, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 21182220.0 | 08.08.2012 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | US201161521309P | 08.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521309 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909465 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/14, F41H1/02, A45F5/02, A45C13/30, A44B18/00, A45F3/00, F42B39/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A45F5/02 (EP,US);
A44B18/00 (US);
A44B18/0073 (US);
A45F3/00 (US);
A45F3/14 (EP,US);
A45F5/021 (US);
F42B39/02 (EP,US);
A45C13/30 (EP,US);
A45C2013/306 (EP,US);
A45F2003/001 (US);
A45F2003/146 (US);
Y10T24/13 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1382 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR LEICHTGEWICHTIGE MODULARE | [2021/46] | English: | LIGHT WEIGHT MODULAR POUCH ATTACHMENT SYSTEM | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION DE POCHE MODULAIRE DE POIDS LÉGER | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12822829.3 / EP2741631 | EP17163240.9 / EP3205230 | EP18177145.2 / EP3391775 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005005342 (JOHNSON MATTHEW A [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009051619 (MCBRIDE WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 9-14; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5724707 | US7047570 |