Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3936482 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201880020903 CN202211417044 EP18708305 EP21182864 EP21182882 JP2019544899 JP2023076637 KR20197027432 KR20237032121 US2018018707W

More

US201815899689 US201816050486 US201916539611 US202117177538 US202217899903 US202418635667



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024279102Global Dossier 22.08.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202117177538 17.02.2021
US202217899903 31.08.2022
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US202418635667 15.04.2024
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11987516Global Dossier 21.05.2024B2
US2022411311 29.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202217899903 31.08.2022
US202117177538 17.02.2021
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11465927Global Dossier 11.10.2022B2
US2021246064 12.08.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202117177538 17.02.2021
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10954154Global Dossier 23.03.2021B2
US2018237326 23.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10773988Global Dossier 15.09.2020B2
US2019367403 05.12.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816050486 31.07.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201916539611 13.08.2019
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10450215Global Dossier 22.10.2019B2
US2018339930 29.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201816050486 31.07.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201815899689 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102709431BGlobal Dossier 25.09.2024B1
KR20230143618 12.10.2023A
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
KR20197027432 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102582718BGlobal Dossier 26.09.2023B1
KR20190122226 29.10.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2023103321Global Dossier 26.07.2023A
Priority number Date
JP2019544899 20.02.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7277369BGlobal Dossier 18.05.2023B2
JP2020508957 26.03.2020A
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3954662Global Dossier 08.01.2025B1
EP3954662 16.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP18708305 20.02.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3507253Global Dossier 11.08.2021B1
EP3507253 10.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115677240BGlobal Dossier 10.09.2024B
CN115677240 03.02.2023A
Priority number Date
CN202211417044 20.02.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
CN201880020903 20.02.2018
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110461781BGlobal Dossier 15.11.2022B
CN110461781 15.11.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3936482Global Dossier 12.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP18708305 20.02.2018
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
WO2018US18707 20.02.2018
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018152495Global Dossier 23.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202018006739U 20.07.2022U1
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201834853 01.10.2018A
Priority number Date
US201762461494 21.02.2017
US201762586938 16.11.2017
US201762461080 20.02.2017
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3507253