EP3933703 - DYNAMIC LOADING NEURAL NETWORK INFERENCE AT DRAM/ON-BUS SRAM/SERIAL FLASH FOR POWER OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIATEK INC. No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSIAO, Chih-Hsiang Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
HSU, Chia-Feng Hsinchu City / TW | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstraße 2 81679 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21183203.5 | 01.07.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US202063047939P | 03.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063047939 P | US202017097501 | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US202017097501 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933703 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06N3/045 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP);
G06F9/44521 (CN,US);
G06F1/3275 (US);
G06F13/28 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | G06N3/04, G06N3/063 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE BELASTUNG NEURONALER NETZWERKINFERENZ BEI DRAM/ON-BUS SRAM/SERIELLEM FLASH ZUR LEISTUNGSOPTIMIERUNG | [2022/01] | English: | DYNAMIC LOADING NEURAL NETWORK INFERENCE AT DRAM/ON-BUS SRAM/SERIAL FLASH FOR POWER OPTIMIZATION | [2022/01] | French: | INFÉRENCE DE RÉSEAU DE NEURONES DE CHARGEMENT DYNAMIQUE AU DRAM/ON-BUS SRAM/SERIAL FLASH POUR L'OPTIMISATION DE PUISSANCE | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |