EP4000993 - CHARGING COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Electronics Inc. No. 16, Tungyuan Road Chungli Dist. Taoyuan City 320023 / TW | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Jui-Yuan 320023 Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
HSIEH, Hung-Sheng 320023 Taoyuan City / TW | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21183310.8 | 01.07.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | CN202011330930 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011330930 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000993 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/16, H01R13/502, H01R13/506, H01R13/514, H01R13/52 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B60L53/16 (EP,CN,US);
H01R13/5202 (EP,CN);
H01R13/5205 (US);
H01R13/502 (CN);
H01R13/6275 (US);
H01R43/005 (US);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADEKOPPLER | [2022/21] | English: | CHARGING COUPLER | [2022/21] | French: | COUPLEUR DE CHARGE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 15.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015295344 (SAWADA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0070] *; | [A]CN207691091U (KANG SI LI DA SHANGHAI AUTOMOTIVE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 ** paragraphs [0005] - [0017] *; | [XI]CN210985073U (BYD CO LTD) [X] 1,6,8-14 * figures 1-5,6a,6b * * paragraphs [0023] - [0033] * [I] 2-5,7,15 |