EP3943344 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRECONDITIONING A VEHICLE PRIOR TO A VEHICLE-SHARING SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNTE, Christian Southfield, 48086 / US | 02 /
NESPOLO, Martin Southfield, 48086 / US | 03 /
KANDASAMY, Nandhinee Southfield, 48086 / US | 04 /
MAHMOUD, Mustafa Southfield, 48086 / US | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21183655.6 | 05.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | US202063055527P | 23.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063055527 P | US202117218409 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: US202117218409 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943344 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/20, B60H1/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B60R25/209 (EP);
G05D1/0011 (US);
B60H1/00657 (EP,US);
B60H1/00735 (EP);
B60H1/00778 (EP);
B60H1/00892 (US);
B60K35/80 (EP);
B60R16/023 (US);
B60R16/037 (US);
G05B13/048 (US);
G06Q30/0283 (US);
G06Q50/40 (US);
A61B5/6893 (US);
B60K2360/48 (EP);
B60K2360/55 (EP);
G06Q2240/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VORKONDITIONIERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS VOR EINER FAHRZEUGMITBENUTZUNGSSITZUNG | [2022/04] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRECONDITIONING A VEHICLE PRIOR TO A VEHICLE-SHARING SESSION | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRÉCONDITIONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE AVANT UNE SESSION DE PARTAGE DE VÉHICULE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US10554759 (PENILLA ANGEL A [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * column 3, lines 35-60; figures 1,6 * * column 4, lines 29-40 ** column 8, lines 15-18 * |