EP3929301 - GLYCOENGINEERED ANTIBODY, ANTIBODY-CONJUGATE AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SynAffix B.V. Molenstraat 110 5342 CC Oss / NL | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Delft, Floris Louis Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
van Geel, Remon Oss / NL | 03 /
Wijdeven, Maria Antonia Wijchen / NL | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21184055.8 | 14.10.2014 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | EP20130188585 | 14.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13188585 | EP20140165581 | 23.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14165581 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929301 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12P21/08, C07K16/32, A61K47/68, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P43/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (EP,US);
A61K47/6889 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12P21/005 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | DURCH GLYCO-ENGINEERING HERGESTELLTER ANTIKÖRPER, ANTIKÖRPERKONJUGAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2021/52] | English: | GLYCOENGINEERED ANTIBODY, ANTIBODY-CONJUGATE AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [2021/52] | French: | ANTICORPS OBTENU PAR GLYCO-INGÉNIERIE, CONJUGUÉ D'ANTICORPS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14790777.8 / EP2935611 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2014065661 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]); | by applicant | US6254868 | WO2004063344 | WO2007095506 | WO2007133855 | WO2008029281 | WO2009025646 | US2009068738 | WO2009067663 | WO2009102820 | US2011207147 | WO2011136645 | WO2013037824 | EP19970916787 |