EP3936355 - AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanon Systems 2, 95, Sinilseo ro Daejeon 306-230 / KR | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Jae Chun 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
HAN, Young Hum 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
KIM, Chul Hee 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
HAN, Joong Man 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
PARK, Tae Yong 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 06 /
AHN, Yong Nam 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 07 /
KIM, Doo Hoon 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 08 /
KIM, Yun Jin 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 09 /
KIM, Hyeon Gyu 306-230 Daejeon / KR | 10 /
LEE, Sung Je 306-230 Daejeon / KR | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Ipside Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | Ipside 29, rue de Lisbonne 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21184139.0 | 18.01.2017 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | KR20160005787 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160005787 | KR20160005816 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160005816 | KR20160005782 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160005782 | KR20160094062 | 25.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160094062 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936355 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/22, B60H1/32 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00028 (EP,US);
B60H1/00021 (CN);
B60H1/00514 (CN);
B60H1/00535 (US);
B60H1/22 (US);
B60H1/2225 (US);
B60H1/3204 (US);
B60H2001/00078 (CN);
B60H2001/00085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGENSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/02] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION POUR VÉHICULE | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 09.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 07.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17151897.0 / EP3192682 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5669813 (JAIRAZBHOY VIVEK AMIR [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2004314759 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 16-19* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2005022600 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0019]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2013105200 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0017] - [0032]; figures 2-3; claims 1-5 *; | [XY]JP2013141932 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0037]; figures 1-6A; claims 1-8 * [Y] 4-6,11,14-19; | [Y]EP2679419 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * |