EP3944602 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIBE, Shoei Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Hisashi Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21184177.0 | 07.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | JP20200124642 | 21.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020124642 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944602 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/405, H04N1/52 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04N1/4053 (EP);
H04N1/6027 (US);
H04N1/52 (EP);
H04N1/6008 (US);
H04N1/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND NICHTFLÜCHTIGES COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/04] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE SUR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6250733 (YAO MENG [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * column 1 - column 2 * * column 6 - column 8; figure 7 * [A] 1,6-12; | [A]JP2012216933 (RISO KAGAKU CORP) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] *; | [IY]US2020045208 (DOI TSUKASA [JP], et al) [I] 1,6-12 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0112]; figures 1, 4-6, 11-13 * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | US5111310 | US6867884 |