EP3936908 - PHASE MODULATOR AND PHASE MODULATOR ARRAY INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Junghyun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 02 /
WANG, Yifei Stanford, 94305-2038 / US | 03 /
BRONGERSMA, Mark L. Stanford, 94305-2038 / US | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21184296.8 | 07.07.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | US202063049903P | 09.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063049903 P | KR20210037549 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210037549 | KR20210061637 | 12.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210061637 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936908 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01, G02F1/29, B82Y20/00 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
G02F1/292 (EP,US);
H04B10/548 (CN,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
H01Q3/36 (US);
H01Q3/46 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G02B5/30, G02B6/122, G02B27/28, G02F1/37, G02F2/02, H01S3/00, B82Y20/00, G01N21/19, G01R31/3185, G06F1/00, G02F1/31, G02F1/00, G02F1/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHASENMODULATOR UND PHASENMODULATOR-ARRAY DAMIT | [2022/02] | English: | PHASE MODULATOR AND PHASE MODULATOR ARRAY INCLUDING THE SAME | [2022/02] | French: | MODULATEUR DE PHASE ET RÉSEAU DE MODULATEUR DE PHASE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8711463 (HAN SEUNG-HOON [KR], et al); | [A]US2018059505 (KYOUNG JISOO [KR], et al); | [XYI]KR20180082305 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]US2019018299 (PARK JUNGHYUN [KR], et al); | [A]US10199415 (AKSELROD GLEB M [US], et al); | [A]WO2019134488 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]US2019235228 (CHOU JEFFREY [US], et al); | [Y]US2020081275 (KIM SUNIL [KR], et al); | [Y]US2020183148 (PARK JUNGHYUN [KR], et al); |