EP3960544 - VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH A FAIRING UNDER THE FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE-FEVRE, Olivier 91620 LA VILLE DU BOIS / FR | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21184344.6 | 07.07.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | FR20200008494 | 14.08.2020 Original published format: FR 2008494 | [2022/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960544 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/08, B62D35/02, B60K15/063, B60K15/067 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B60R13/0861 (EP);
B60K15/063 (EP);
B60K15/067 (EP);
B62D35/02 (EP);
B60K2015/03493 (EP);
B60K2015/0631 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT EINER VERKLEIDUNG UNTER DEM KRAFTSTOFFTANK | [2022/09] | English: | VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH A FAIRING UNDER THE FUEL TANK | [2022/09] | French: | VÉHICULE DOTÉ D'UN CARÉNAGE SOUS LE RÉSERVOIR À CARBURANT | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2006168527 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]DE102013003461 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]); | [Y]DE102016223749 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]EP3415355 (FCA ITALY SPA [IT]) |