EP3937231 - PACKAGE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No. 8, Li-Hsin Rd. 6 Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu 300-78 / TW | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ming-Fa Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
SHIH, Chao-Wen Hsinchu / TW | 03 /
LIU, Tzuan-Horng Hsinchu / TW | 04 /
HU, Jen-Li Hsinchu / TW | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21184505.2 | 08.07.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | US202016924216 | 09.07.2020 Original published format: US202016924216 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3937231 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3937231 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/522, H01L23/00, // H01L25/065, H01L21/60 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H01L23/5227 (EP);
H01L25/50 (EP,CN);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L21/76807 (US);
H01L23/481 (EP);
H01L23/5222 (US);
H01L23/5223 (EP);
H01L23/5226 (US);
H01L23/645 (US);
H01L24/03 (US);
H01L25/0657 (EP);
H01L25/105 (EP);
H01L25/16 (CN);
H01L2224/05546 (EP);
H01L2224/05624 (EP);
H01L2224/05639 (EP);
H01L2224/05644 (EP);
H01L2224/05647 (EP);
H01L2224/05684 (EP);
H01L2224/08145 (EP);
H01L2224/08146 (EP);
H01L2224/09181 (EP);
H01L2224/73251 (EP);
H01L2224/80047 (EP);
H01L2224/80357 (EP);
H01L2224/80895 (EP);
H01L2224/80896 (EP);
H01L2224/9222 (EP);
H01L2224/94 (EP);
H01L2224/96 (EP);
H01L2225/0651 (EP);
H01L2225/06541 (EP);
H01L2225/06568 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L24/80 (EP);
H01L2924/1205 (US);
H01L2924/1206 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05639, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05644, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05684, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73251, H01L2224/08, H01L2224/20 (EP);
H01L2224/80047, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/80895, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/80896, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/9222, H01L2224/80001, H01L2224/19 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/80001 (EP);
H01L2224/96, H01L2224/19 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/02] | H01L23/522, // H01L25/065, H01L21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/02] | English: | PACKAGE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2022/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013037965 (MORIMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0044] *; | [X]US2015001948 (BRAUCHLER FRED T [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] *; | [X]US9716088 (EDELSTEIN DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US2018190580 (HABA BELGACEM [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] , [0082] *; | [X]US2018240860 (YANG CHIH-CHAO [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0070] *; | [X]US2018366409 (KUWABARA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0086] *; | [X]US2019122931 (HUANG SHIH-HAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0053] *; | [X]US2019148342 (HU CHIH-CHIA [TW], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US2019157333 (TSAI BO-TSUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] *; | [X]US10431565 (KIM MYONGSEOB [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]CN110998846 (YANGTZE MEMORY TECH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XP]US2021134779 (HUANG SHIQI [CN], et al) [XP] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] , [0065] , [0066] , [0071] , [0078] , [0085] * |