EP3917052 - FLEXIBLE TRANSMISSION UNIT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT FEEDBACK TIMELINE FOR EFFICIENT LOW LATENCY COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Jing San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
JI, Tingfang San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ANG, Peter Pui Lok San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SORIAGA, Joseph Binamira San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna Kiran San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21184560.7 | 09.12.2016 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US201562265944P | 10.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562265944 P | US201615373427 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: US201615373427 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917052 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/16, H04L1/00 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H04L1/1607 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/1273 (CN,KR,US);
H04J3/1694 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINHEIT UND BESTÄTIGUNGSFEEDBACKZEITLEISTE ZUR EFFIZIENTEN KOMMUNIKATION MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ | [2021/48] | English: | FLEXIBLE TRANSMISSION UNIT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT FEEDBACK TIMELINE FOR EFFICIENT LOW LATENCY COMMUNICATION | [2021/48] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION FLEXIBLE ET CHRONOLOGIE DE RÉTROACTION D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION POUR COMMUNICATION EFFICACE À FAIBLE LATENCE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 12.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16820453.5 / EP3387772 | EP19151639.2 / EP3493449 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009201838 (ZHANG WENFENG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 13,14 ** paragraph [0084] *; | [A]US2013294411 (TSAI SHIAU-HE SHAWN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-6 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0057] - [0062] * | by applicant | US2013294411 |