EP3915639 - METHODS AND COMPOSTIONS FOR POTENTIATING THE ACTION OF OPIOID ANALGESICS USING IBOGA ALKALOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DemeRx, Inc. 1951 NW 7th Ave, Suite 600 Miami, FL 33136 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAILLET, Emeline Miami, Florida 33136 / US | 02 /
WEIS, Holger Miami, Florida 33136 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21184614.2 | 25.11.2015 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US201462084979P | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462084979 P | US201562119021P | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119021 P | US201561996996P | 07.04.2015 Original published format: US 201561996996 P | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915639 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915639 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61K31/4025, A61K31/439, A61K31/4535, A61K31/485, A61K31/55, A61P25/36 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K36/24 (EP,US);
A61P25/36 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4025, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4535, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2021/48] | A61P25/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR POTENZIERUNG DER WIRKUNG VON OPIOIDANALGETIKA MITHILFE VON IBOGA-ALKALOIDEN | [2021/48] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSTIONS FOR POTENTIATING THE ACTION OF OPIOID ANALGESICS USING IBOGA ALKALOIDS | [2021/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR POTENTIALISER L'ACTION D'ANALGÉSIQUES OPIOÏDES EN UTILISANT DES ALCALOÏDES DE L'IBOGA | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 24.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15864244.7 / EP3223906 | EP20210036.8 / EP3845275 | Divisional application(s) | EP23177125.4 / EP4279134 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014315891 (MASH DEBORAH C [US]) | by applicant | US6348456 | US2012253037 | US8362007 | WO2013040471 | US2013131046 | US2013165647 | US2013165425 | US2013165414 | US2013303756 | US2014288056 | US19540135934 |