EP3949954 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING N-(3,5-DIMETHOXYPHENYL)-N'-(1-METHYLETHYL)-N-[3-(1-METHYL-1H-PYRAZOL-4-YL)QUINOXALIN-6-YL]ETHANE-1,2-DIAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astex Therapeutics Limited 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB4 0QA / GB | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROGGINI, Diego Fernando Domenico CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21184714.0 | 09.02.2016 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | EP20150154554 | 10.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15154554 | EP20150188982 | 08.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15188982 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949954 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K47/18, C07D403/04, A61K31/498, A61P35/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/498 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5513 (CN,IL);
A61K47/18 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K47/26 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (CN,IL);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 09.07.2021 | ME | 09.07.2021 | Validation states | MA | 09.07.2021 | MD | 09.07.2021 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT N-(3,5-DIMETHOXYPHENYL)-N'-(1-METHYLETHYL)-N-[3-(1-METHYL-1H-PYRAZOL-4-YL)QUINOXALIN-6-YL]ETHANE-1,2-DIAMINE | [2022/06] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING N-(3,5-DIMETHOXYPHENYL)-N'-(1-METHYLETHYL)-N-[3-(1-METHYL-1H-PYRAZOL-4-YL)QUINOXALIN-6-YL]ETHANE-1,2-DIAMINE | [2022/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT N-(3,5-DIMETHOXYPHENYL)-N'-(1-METHYLETHYL)-N-[3-(1-METHYL-1H-PYRAZOL-4-YL)QUINOXALIN-6-YL]ETHANE-1,2-DIAMINE | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 02.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16706551.5 / EP3256109 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US5882864 | US6218529 | WO2011135376 |