EP3941009 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND DEMODULATING AN RF SIGNAL MODULE IN AMPLITUDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/03] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND DEMODULATING AN AMPLITUDE-MODULATED RF SIGNAL | ||
[2024/39] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives 25 Rue Leblanc Bat Le Ponant 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANY, Clément 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
MARTINEAU, Baudouin 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21185423.7 | 13.07.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | FR20200007514 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007514 | [2022/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941009 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/02 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04L27/02 (EP);
H03C5/00 (US);
H01Q1/36 (US);
H03C3/40 (US);
H04L27/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANG UND DEMODULATION EINES HF-SIGNALMODULS IN AMPLITUDE | [2024/39] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND DEMODULATING AN RF SIGNAL MODULE IN AMPLITUDE | [2024/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION ET DE DÉMODULATION D'UN SIGNAL RF MODULÉ EN AMPLITUDE | [2022/03] |
Former [2022/03] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANG UND ZUR DEMODULATION EINES AMPLITUDENMODULIERTEN HOCHFREQUENZSIGNALS | ||
Former [2022/03] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND DEMODULATING AN AMPLITUDE-MODULATED RF SIGNAL | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007206702 (ADLER BERND [DE], et al); | [Y]US2009156155 (KRUG ERWIN [DE], et al) |