EP3943394 - AIR DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR USE IN AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MABEN, DOUGLAS DEAN CHICAGO, 60606-1596 / US | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21185438.5 | 13.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | US202063055455P | 23.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063055455 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943394 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64D13/00, B64D13/06 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B64D13/00 (EP);
B64D13/06 (EP,CN);
B64D13/02 (US);
B64D11/003 (US);
B64D2013/003 (EP,US);
B64D2013/0603 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM FLUGZEUG | [2022/04] | English: | AIR DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR USE IN AN AIRCRAFT | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'AIR POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS UN AÉRONEF | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 20.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4742760 (HORSTMAN RAYMOND H [US], et al); | [X]US2007164158 (BUCHHOLZ UWE [DE], et al); | [Y]US2009061754 (HLAVKA BRIAN D [US], et al); | [X]DE102008026093 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]); | [XY]US2016318614 (BULTEMEIER ERIC JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]EP2851298 (BOEING CO [US]); |