EP3940787 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Youngjin 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Na, Jisu 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Moon, Joongsoo 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Shin, Juncheol 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Jeon, Byeongguk 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21185480.7 | 14.07.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | KR20200089155 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: KR 20200089155 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940787 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H10K59/124 (EP,KR,US);
G09F9/301 (CN);
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/40 (US);
H10K59/8731 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0446 (US);
H10K2102/341 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/03] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017331058 (SEO TAEAN [KR], et al) [Y] 4,8,9 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0080] *; | [Y]US2019019966 (JIANG WENXIN [CN], et al) [Y] 5-7,12-17 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117] *; | [XY]US2019229175 (LHEE ZAIL [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2, 10, 11 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0119] * [Y] 5-9,13-17; | [XYI]EP3644369 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,10 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0094] * [Y] 4,7,12 [I] 3,11; | [Y]US2020185647 (LEE JUHEE [KR], et al) [Y] 14-17 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0057] ** paragraph [0106] * |