EP3917063 - SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNALS WITH COLLISIONS IN ASYMMETRIC CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUN, Jing San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
XU, Hao San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21185580.4 | 05.04.2017 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US201662333035P | 06.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662333035 P | US201715479113 | 04.04.2017 Original published format: US201715479113 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917063 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W56/00, H04W72/04 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0051 (KR);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/14 (CN,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W8/24 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | SCHALLREFERENZSIGNALE MIT KOLLISIONEN IN ASYMMETRISCHER TRÄGERAGGREGATION | [2021/48] | English: | SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNALS WITH COLLISIONS IN ASYMMETRIC CARRIER AGGREGATION | [2021/48] | French: | SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DE SONDAGE AVEC COLLISIONS DANS UNE AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES ASYMÉTRIQUES | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17719413.1 / EP3453132 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011267955 (DALSGAARD LARS [FI]); | [X]US2013121316 (SKOV PETER [CN], et al) |