EP3944502 - TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM FOR ADC COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN VELDHOVEN, Robert 5650 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21185584.6 | 14.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | US202016933617 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: US202016933617 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944502 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06, G06N3/08, G06N3/063, G06N3/084, H03M1/12 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP);
H03M1/1009 (CN,US);
H03M1/0626 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G06N3/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/084 (EP);
H03M1/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H03M1/06, G06N3/08, H03M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAINING EINES MASCHINENLERNSYSTEMS FÜR ADC-KOMPENSATION | [2022/04] | English: | TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM FOR ADC COMPENSATION | [2022/04] | French: | FORMATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE POUR LA COMPENSATION DE CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMÉRIQUE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104779779 (UNIV XIAMEN TECHNOLOGY); |