EP3940894 - FIXING ELEMENT FOR PE CONTACTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieland Electric GmbH Brennerstrasse 10-14 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayer, Markus 96135 Stegaurach / DE | 02 /
Schöpplein, Helmut 96188 Stettfeld / DE | 03 /
Hunger, Rainer 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | 04 /
Pfaff, Frank 96181 Rauhenebrach / DE | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Längenstrasse 14 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/03] | Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Längenstrasse 14 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21185764.4 | 15.07.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | DE202010118899 | 16.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020118899 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940894 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3940894 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01R25/14, // H01R13/655 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H01R25/142 (EP);
H01R13/655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FIXIERUNGSELEMENT FÜR PE-KONTAKTIERUNG | [2022/03] | English: | FIXING ELEMENT FOR PE CONTACTING | [2022/03] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION POUR LE CONTACT PE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5785817U ; | [X]EP1475565 (RIDI LEUCHTEN GMBH [DE]) |