EP3944902 - DEVICE FOR GLAZING PRODUCTS AND RELATED PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Impianti Srl 376 Via Vandelli 41053 Maranello (MO) / IT | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHINCO, Francesco 41043 FORMIGINE (MO) / IT | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 21185853.5 | 15.07.2021 | [2022/05] | Priority number, date | IT20200018292 | 28.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018292 | IT20210008606 | 07.04.2021 Original published format: IT202100008606 | [2022/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944902 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/00, B05C11/10, B28B11/04, B05C5/02 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
B05C5/027 (EP);
B05C11/1013 (EP);
B05C5/005 (EP);
B28B11/044 (EP);
B28B11/047 (EP);
B28B11/049 (EP);
B28B17/0081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM GLASIEREN VON WAREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ANLAGE | [2022/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR GLAZING PRODUCTS AND RELATED PLANT | [2022/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET INSTALLATION DE GLAÇURAGE DE PRODUITS | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB984639 (ROBERT BUERKLE, et al) [X] 1,4,15 * page 2, line 66 - line 75 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE1652437 (SOPOCKIE ZAKLADY PRZEMYSLU MAS) [X] 1,2,4,12,13 * pages 7,8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [X]JPH0532471 (INAX CORP) [X] 1,4,14,15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0019] *; | [X]ES1033927U (PALLARES LATORRE FEDERICO S [ES], et al) [X] 1,4,12,13,15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047] ** figures 1,13 *; | [XI]WO2020121050 (TECNO ITALIA S R L [IT]) [X] 1,5-7,10 * page 2, line 17 - line 20 * * page 6, line 11 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 2 * [I] 8,9,11 |