EP3950259 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LENS HOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K.L. Kaschier- und Laminier GmbH Gewerbepark Kopenhagener Strasse 3 48455 Bad Bentheim-Gildehaus / DE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze Wehninck, Rembert 82327 Tutzing / DE | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstraße 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21186284.2 | 19.07.2021 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | DE202010120869 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020120869 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950259 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950259 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, G03B17/55, H05B3/84, G03B11/04, // B60R11/00, B29L11/00, B29L31/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B29C45/14639 (EP);
B29C45/14811 (EP);
G03B11/045 (EP);
H05B3/84 (EP);
B29C2045/14868 (EP);
B29C45/14008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER STREULICHTBLENDE | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LENS HOOD | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BLINDAGE ANTI-LUMIÈRE DIFFUSÉE | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0788724 (DECOMA INT INC [CA]); | [A]EP1577084 (KRD COATINGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102006032678 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [YD]EP3193561 (K L KASCHIER- UND LAMINIER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3364716 (K L KASCHIER UND LAMINIER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102018133498 (KURABE IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]DE102018130103 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) | Examination | EP0788724 | by applicant | EP3193561 | EP3193561 | EP20180000969 |