EP3943479 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 5,5-DIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTENE-1-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS AND 3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTENE-1-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS FROM 3,3-DIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS AND 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS, AND 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Tomohiro Joetsu-shi, 942-8601 / JP | 02 /
KINSHO, Takeshi Joetsu-shi, 942-8601 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Miyoshi Joetsu-shi, 942-8601 / JP | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21186477.2 | 19.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | JP20200125810 | 22.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020125810 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943479 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3943479 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/313, C07C69/593 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C07C69/593 (EP,CN,US);
C07C67/313 (EP,CN,US);
C07C67/327 (US);
C07B2200/09 (CN);
C07C2601/10 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/313, C07C69/757 (US,CN,EP);
C07C67/327, C07C69/757 (US);
C07C67/343, C07C69/593 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5,5-DIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTEN-1-CARBOXYLAT-VERBINDUNGEN UND 3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTEN-1-CARBOXYLAT-VERBINDUNGEN AUS 3,3-DIMETHYL-1-BUTEN-1,4-DICARBOXYLAT-VERBINDUNGEN UND 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTEN-1,4-DICARBOXYLAT-VERBINDUNGEN SOWIE 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTEN-1,4-DICARBOXYLAT-VERBINDUNGEN | [2022/04] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 5,5-DIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTENE-1-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS AND 3,5,5-TRIMETHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTENE-1-CARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS FROM 3,3-DIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS AND 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS, AND 1,3,3-TRIMETHYL-1-BUTENE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE COMPOUNDS | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS DE 5,5-DIMÉTHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTÈNE-1-CARBOXYLATE ET DE COMPOSÉS DE 3,5,5-TRIMÉTHYL-2-OXO-3-CYCLOPENTÈNE-1-CARBOXYLATE À PARTIR DE COMPOSÉS DE 3,3-DIMÉTHYL-1-BUTÈNE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE ET DE COMPOSÉS DE 1,3,3-TRIMÉTHYL-1-BUTÈNE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE ET DE COMPOSÉS DE 1,3,3-TRIMÉTHYL-1-BUTÈNE-1,4-DICARBOXYLATE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - J. RICHERS ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (2017), vol. 23, pages 3178 - 3183, XP055869746 [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201605362 | by applicant | - J. G. MILLAR et al., J. Agric. FoodChem., (20100000), vol. 58, pages 4977 - 4982 | - A. LEVI-ZADA et al., J. Chem. Ecol., (20190000), vol. 45, pages 455 - 463 | - J. RICHERS et al., Chem. Eur. J., (20170000), vol. 23, pages 3178 - 3183 |