EP3944322 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2025 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives 25 Rue Leblanc Bat Le Ponant 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/03] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bat le Ponant 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEBOJEWSKI, Heimanu 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
ANDRIEU, François 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 03 /
FENOUILLET-BERANGER, Claire 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/21] |
Former [2022/04] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21186804.7 | 20.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | FR20200007684 | 22.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007684 | [2022/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944322 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3944322 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/13, H01L21/84, H01L21/762 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H10D86/80 (EP,US);
H01L21/76224 (US);
H01L21/76232 (EP);
H01L21/76283 (EP,US);
H10D62/10 (US);
H10D64/01 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H01L27/13, H01L21/84, H01L21/762, H01L49/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF MICROÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2024 | BG | 22.05.2024 | CZ | 22.05.2024 | DK | 22.05.2024 | EE | 22.05.2024 | ES | 22.05.2024 | FI | 22.05.2024 | HR | 22.05.2024 | IT | 22.05.2024 | LV | 22.05.2024 | MC | 22.05.2024 | NL | 22.05.2024 | PL | 22.05.2024 | RO | 22.05.2024 | SI | 22.05.2024 | SK | 22.05.2024 | LU | 20.07.2024 | BE | 31.07.2024 | CH | 31.07.2024 | NO | 22.08.2024 | RS | 22.08.2024 | GR | 23.08.2024 | IS | 22.09.2024 | PT | 23.09.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/17] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2024 | ||
DK | 22.05.2024 | ||
EE | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IT | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
MC | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
RO | 22.05.2024 | ||
SK | 22.05.2024 | ||
LU | 20.07.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2025/11] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2024 | ||
DK | 22.05.2024 | ||
EE | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IT | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
MC | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
RO | 22.05.2024 | ||
SK | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2025/10] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2024 | ||
DK | 22.05.2024 | ||
EE | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
RO | 22.05.2024 | ||
SK | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2025/09] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
DK | 22.05.2024 | ||
EE | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
DK | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
LV | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
PL | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
RS | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 22.05.2024 | |
BG | 22.05.2024 | ||
ES | 22.05.2024 | ||
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 22.05.2024 | |
FI | 22.05.2024 | ||
HR | 22.05.2024 | ||
NL | 22.05.2024 | ||
NO | 22.08.2024 | ||
GR | 23.08.2024 | ||
IS | 22.09.2024 | ||
PT | 23.09.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2002079537 (HOUSTON THEODORE W [US]); | [IA]US2002171120 (MAEDA SHIGENOBU [JP], et al); | [IA]US2012025345 (BOTULA ALAN B [US], et al); | [IA]US2014084412 (CHOU ANTHONY I [US], et al); | [IA]WO2017142849 (SUNEDISON SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [SG]); | [A]EP3531444 (ST MICROELECTRONICS CROLLES 2 SAS [FR]); | [IA]FR3091004 (SOITEC SILICON ON INSULATOR [FR]); | [IA]US2020219760 (KANTAROVSKY JOHNATAN A [US], et al) | by applicant | US5773151 | US2018069079 |