EP3954369 - SALTS AND PRODRUGS OF 1-METHYL-D-TRYPTOPHAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumos Pharma, Inc. 2503 South Loop Drive Building 5, Suite 5100 Ames, IA 50010-8646 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUTINO, Mario Ames, 50010 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Sanjeev Ames, 50010 / US | 03 /
JAIPURI, Firoz Ames, 50010 / US | 04 /
WALDO, Jesse Ames, 50010 / US | 05 /
POTTURI, Hima Ames, 50010 / US | 06 /
ZHUANG, Hong Ames, 50010 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21187070.4 | 02.06.2016 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201562196671P | 24.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196671 P | US201662305748P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662305748 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954369 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/405, A61K31/198, A61K31/661, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D209/20, C07C309/04, C07C309/20, C07F9/6574, A61K31/285, A61P37/02, A61P37/04, A61P35/00, A61P43/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C07D209/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/24 (CN);
A61K31/285 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C309/04 (EP,US);
C07C309/20 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07F9/65742 (EP,CN,US);
C07K5/06026 (CN);
C07K5/06034 (CN);
C07K5/06043 (CN);
C07K5/0606 (CN);
C07K5/06078 (CN);
C07K5/06086 (CN);
C07K5/06104 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SALZE UND PRODRUGS VON 1-METHYL-D-TRYPTOPHAN | [2022/07] | English: | SALTS AND PRODRUGS OF 1-METHYL-D-TRYPTOPHAN | [2022/07] | French: | SELS ET PROMÉDICAMENTS DE 1-MÉTHYL-D-TRYPTOPHANE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 16.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16830974.8 / EP3324958 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007081878 (MED COLLEGE GEORGIA RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-14 * page 43, line 7 - line 12 * * claims 1-38 * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]WO2008100562 (MED COLLEGE GEORGIA RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-14 * page 21, line 5 - line 25 * * claims 1-25 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y] - HAYNES D A ET AL, "Occurrence of pharmaceutically acceptable anions and cations in the Cambridge Structural Database", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES,, (20051001), vol. 94, no. 10, pages 2111 - 2120, XP002593272 [Y] 1-14 * page 2113, column 2; table table * * tables 2, 5 * | [Y] - SERAJUDDIN ET AL, "Salt formation to improve drug solubility", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, (20070824), vol. 59, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2007.05.010, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 603 - 616, XP022211982 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.05.010 | [Y] - SAAL C ET AL, "Pharmaceutical salts: A summary on doses of salt formers from the Orange Book", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130605), vol. 49, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.EJPS.2013.05.026, ISSN 0928-0987, pages 614 - 623, XP028676562 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * table 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejps.2013.05.026 | by applicant | WO2008115804 | WO2009073620 | US7598287 | WO2009132238 | US7705022 | US7714139 | WO2011056652 | WO2012142237 | US8476454 | WO2014081689 | WO2014141110 | WO2014150646 | WO2014150677 | US8846726 | WO2014159248 | WO2014186035 | WO2015002918 | WO2015006520 | US8951536 | US8993605 | - J. Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 51, no. 16, pages 4968 - 4977 | - PAUL COXDONALD CRAIGSTEPHANOS IOANNIDISVOLKER S. RAHN, Tetrahedron Letters, (20050000), vol. 46, page 4687 | - MCGAHA, T.L. et al., "Amino acid catabolism: a pivotal regulator of innate and adaptive immunity", Immunol Rev, (20120000), vol. 249, no. 1, pages 135 - 57 | - LI, L et al., "Altered tryptophan metabolism as a paradigm for good and bad aspects of immune privilege in chronic inflammatory diseases", Front Immunol, (20120000), vol. 3, page 109 | - MUNN, D.H. et al., "Prevention of allogeneic fetal rejection by tryptophan catabolism", science, (19980000), vol. 281, no. 5380, doi:10.1126/science.281.5380.1191, pages 1191 - 3, XP002147184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.281.5380.1191 | - MULLER, A.J. et al., "inhibition of indoleamine 2,3-dioxygenase, an immunoregulatory target of the cancer suppression gene Binl, potentiates cancer chemotherapy", Nat Med, (20050000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 312 - 9 | - PETERSON, A.C. et al., "Evaluation offunctionalized tryptophan derivatives and related compounds as competitive inhibitors of indoleamine 2,3-dioxygenase", Medicinal Chemistry Research, (19940000), vol. 3, pages 531 - 544, XP002106395 | - HOU, D.Y. et al., "Inhibition of indoleamine 2,3- ioxygenase in dendritic cells by stereoisomers of 1-methyl-tryptophan correlates with antitumor responses", Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 67, no. 2, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-2925, pages 792 - 801, XP055557102 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-2925 | - METZ, R. et al., "IDO inhibits a tryptophan sufficiency signal that stimulates mTOR: A novel IDO effector pathway targeted by D-l-methyl-tryptophan", Oncoimmunology, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 1460 - 1468 | - SHARMA, M.D., "Plasmacytoid dendritic cells from mouse tumor-draining lymph nodes directly activate mature Tregs via indoleamine 2,3-dioxygenase.", I Clin Invest, (20070000), vol. 117, no. 9, pages 2570 - 82 | - HOLMGAARD, R.B. et al., "indoleamine 2,3- ioxygenase is a critical resistance mechanism in antitumor T cell immunotherapy targeting CTLA-4.", J Exp Med, (20130000), vol. 210, no. 7, pages 1389 - 402 | - MUNN, D.H. et al., "GCN2 kinase in T cells mediates proliferative arrest and anergy induction in response to indoleamine 2,3--dioxygencise", Immunity, (20050000), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 633 - 42 | - FALLARINO, F. et al., "The combined effects of tryptophan starvation and tryptophan catabolites down-regulate T cell receptor zeta-chain and induce a regulatory phenotype in naive T cells", J Immunol, (20060000), vol. 176, no. 11, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.176.11.6752, pages 6752 - 61, XP002729121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.176.11.6752 | - KUMAR, S., "Structure based development of phenylimidazole-derived inhibitors of indoleamine 2,3-dioxygenase", J Med Chem, (20080000), vol. 51, no. 16, doi:10.1021/jm800512z, pages 4968 - 77, XP002558480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm800512z | - BANERJEE, T. et al., "A key in vivo antitumor mechanism of action of natural product-based brassinins is inhibition of indole amine 2,3-dioxygenase", Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, no. 20, pages 2851 - 7 |