EP3943423 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF GROUPING OF CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WestRock Packaging Systems, LLC 1000 Abernathy Road NE Atlanta GA 30328 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnain, Jean-Christophe 36000 Chateauroux / FR | 02 /
Limousin, Frederic 36330 Le Poinconnet / FR | 03 /
Avril, Fabrice 36000 Chateauroux / FR | 04 /
Strohm, Amelie 36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21187541.4 | 23.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | US202063056140P | 24.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063056140 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943423 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/08, B65B21/06 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B65G47/082 (EP);
B65G47/261 (US);
B65B17/025 (EP);
B65B35/16 (EP);
B65B35/26 (EP);
B65B35/36 (EP,US);
B65B35/58 (EP,US);
B65B57/10 (US);
B65G21/2072 (US);
B65G43/08 (US);
B65G47/088 (EP);
B65G47/252 (US);
B65G47/847 (US);
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0235 (US);
B65G2201/0252 (EP);
B65G2203/0225 (US);
B65G2203/041 (US);
B65G2207/28 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM GRUPPIEREN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2022/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF GROUPING OF CONTAINERS | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GROUPEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4078357 (IDA NOBLE N) [X] 1,6-8,12 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO9914122 (MEAD CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2008022296 (MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * figure - * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]KR20100011024U (-) [Y] 10,11 * figure 5 *; | [X]US2015191263 (NITSCH THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12-17 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE102018109770 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,12 * figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 9,15,16; | [XP]EP3831728 (OCME SRL [IT]) [XP] 1,12* the whole document * |