EP3955252 - HIGH SPEED CIRCUIT WITH DRIVER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chun-Chia 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
HSIEH, Yao-Tsung 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 03 /
SHIU, Jian-Feng 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 04 /
CHEN, Chao-An 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21187822.8 | 26.07.2021 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US202063063441P | 10.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063063441 P | US202117366386 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: US202117366386 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955252 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/08, G11C7/10 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G11C7/1078 (EP);
G11C5/063 (CN);
H03K19/00315 (US);
G11C11/4074 (CN);
G11C5/147 (CN);
G11C7/1051 (EP);
G11C8/08 (EP);
H03K17/08142 (US);
H03K19/018507 (US);
H03K3/356113 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSSCHALTUNG MIT TREIBERSCHALTUNG | [2022/07] | English: | HIGH SPEED CIRCUIT WITH DRIVER CIRCUIT | [2022/07] | French: | CIRCUIT À GRANDE VITESSE DOTÉ D'UN CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 16.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7948810 (TANG QIANG [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * column 6, line 17 - line 28; figure 4 *; | [XAYI]US2016373092 (STORMS MAURITS [NL], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0064]; figure 1 * [A] 6-12 [Y] 14 [I] 2-5,13,15; | [Y]EP3540737 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [Y] 14* paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0058]; figure 4 * |