EP3945251 - HEAT EXCHANGE SYSTEM COMPRISING AN OUTDOOR UNIT AND AN AIR CONDITIONER INDOOR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/05] | HEAT EXCHANGE SYSTEM FOR OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER | ||
[2023/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Giwee Tech Co Ltd 28-3, East Industrial Park Lishui Nanhai District Foshan / CN | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yuxian Foshan / CN | 02 /
GUO, Pudun Foshan / CN | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 21188041.4 | 27.07.2021 | [2022/05] | Priority number, date | CN202010752843 | 30.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010752843 | [2022/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945251 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3945251 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/16, F24F11/42, F24F11/84, F24F11/873, F25B47/02 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
F24F11/42 (EP,CN);
F24F1/16 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,CN,US);
F24F1/32 (US);
F24F11/64 (CN);
F24F11/873 (EP,CN);
F24F11/88 (CN);
F25B47/022 (EP);
F24F11/89 (US);
F24F2140/20 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/05] | F24F1/16, F24F11/42, F24F11/84, F24F11/873 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2022/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHSYSTEM MIT AUSSENEINHEIT UND INNENEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2023/12] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE SYSTEM COMPRISING AN OUTDOOR UNIT AND AN AIR CONDITIONER INDOOR UNIT | [2023/12] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR AVEC UNITÉ EXTÉRIEURE DE CLIMATISEUR ET CLIMATISEUR | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/05] | WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHSYSTEM FÜR AUSSENEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE SOWIE KLIMAANLAGE | ||
Former [2022/05] | HEAT EXCHANGE SYSTEM FOR OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER | ||
Former [2022/05] | SYSTÈME D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR POUR UNITÉ EXTÉRIEURE DE CLIMATISEUR ET CLIMATISEUR | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 02.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2010121847 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]CN103383157 (GUANGDONG MIDEA ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]CN104764112 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2545112 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |