blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4124445

EP4124445 - REPAIR TOOL AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2023
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.12.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2024  [2024/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2023/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Finger, Lennart
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Schubert, Konstantin
21129 Hamburg / DE
 [2023/05]
Representative(s)Schornack, Oliver
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/05]Schornack, Oliver
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date21188127.128.07.2021
[2023/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4124445
Date:01.02.2023
Language:EN
[2023/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2022
ClassificationIPC:B29C73/30, B29C73/10, B64F5/40
[2023/05]
CPC:
B29C73/30 (EP); B29C73/10 (EP); B64F5/40 (EP);
B64C2001/0072 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REPARATURWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINER VERBUNDSTRUKTUR[2023/05]
English:REPAIR TOOL AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE[2023/05]
French:OUTIL DE RÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION DE STRUCTURE COMPOSITE[2023/05]
Examination procedure02.08.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2024/02]
23.08.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2024/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202303   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US1166876  (VOSBURGH WALTER S [US]) [X] 1,5* the whole document *;
 [X]US3979169  (WHITTLE BENJAMIN) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 38 * * figures 4,5,6,7,8,12 *;
 [X]JPH08192484  (SHOWA AIRCRAFT IND) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0033] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US8113242  (BENNETT BARTON E [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 5, line 34 - line 40 * * figure 5 *;
 [X]FR2999974  (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-10,14,15 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 7, line 10 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [XI]US2015231837  (GEORGESON GARY E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0034] , [0036] , [0040] , [0041] , [0045] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 12;
 [X]JP2016016548  (NAT RES AND DEV AGENCY JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION AGENCY) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * figures 3-7 *;
 [X]US9434139  (DAN-JUMBO EUGENE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 2, line 51 - line 67 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 43 * * figures 5-8 *;
 [X]US2017312943  (IVY WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0068] , [0073] , [0094] * * figures 2,3,4 *;
 [X]US11040507  (SPALDING JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 1 - line 7 * * figures 2,4,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.