EP3944956 - COMPOSITE THIN WINGBOX ARCHITECTURE FOR SUPERSONIC BUSINESS JETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/05] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHZADPOUR, Forouzan CHICAGO, 60606 / US | 02 /
STICKLER, Patrick B. CHICAGO, 60606 / US | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Sandri, Sandro Bugnion S.P.A. Via Pancaldo 68 37138 Verona / IT | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 21188270.9 | 28.07.2021 | [2022/05] | Priority number, date | US202063058019P | 29.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063058019 P | [2022/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944956 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/02, B32B3/04, B32B3/14, B32B3/30, B32B5/12, B32B5/14, B32B5/26, B32B5/30, B32B7/022 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
B64C3/20 (EP);
B64C3/26 (US);
B29C70/342 (US);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B3/04 (EP);
B32B3/14 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B5/12 (EP);
B32B5/142 (EP);
B32B5/145 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B5/30 (EP);
B32B7/022 (EP);
B64C3/185 (US);
B64C3/187 (US);
B64C30/00 (US);
B29K2105/046 (US);
B29K2105/253 (US);
B29K2995/0063 (US);
B29L2031/3085 (US);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2250/44 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (EP);
B32B2262/105 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2266/0235 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2266/08 (EP);
B32B2307/308 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE DÜNNE FLÜGELKASTENARCHITEKTUR FÜR ÜBERSCHALL-BUSINESS-JETS | [2022/05] | English: | COMPOSITE THIN WINGBOX ARCHITECTURE FOR SUPERSONIC BUSINESS JETS | [2022/05] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE CAISSON DE VOILURE MINCE EN COMPOSITE POUR AVIONS D'AFFAIRES SUPERSONIQUES | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 01.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2759470 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 27]; figures 1-10; claims 1-15 * [I] 2,3,5,6,9,11-15; | [XI]GB2575633 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,8 * pages 7,8; figures 2,3; claims 1-15 *[I] 2-7,9-15 |