EP4124422 - PERSONAL CARE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEYER, Christian 61476 Kronberg / DE | 02 /
KNORR, Marvin Thorsten 61476 Kronberg / DE | 03 /
VERSTEGE, Thomas 61476 Kronberg / DE | 04 /
FUELLGRABE, Martin 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 21188505.8 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124422 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/38, B26B19/04 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
B26B19/388 (EP,US);
B26B19/048 (EP);
B26B19/063 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/05] | English: | PERSONAL CARE DEVICE | [2023/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOINS PERSONNELS | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 27.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19601780 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 18,19* the whole document *; | [X]US2008163495 (SMAL OLIVIER [BE]) [X] 2,7 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2208588 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 18,19 * paragraph [0021]; figures 9-11 *; | [X]WO2013140309 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 2,11 * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [X]US2015246454 (MINTZ STUART [US], et al) [X] 2,5,6 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 *; | [XAI]WO2015135682 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 14; figures 1-4 * [A] 4 [I] 3; | [XA]WO2016046142 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 2,11 * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 26; figures 1-3, 8A, 8B * [A] 12-14; | [XA]WO2017220352 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 2,11 * page 12, line 20 - page 27, line 31; figures 1-15 * [A] 12-14; | [XDAI]WO2018069265 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [XD] 2,5,6,8,9 * page 14, line 25 - page 16, line 26; figures 3, 4 * [A] 7 [I] 10; | [XA]EP3546149 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [X] 2,15,16,18 * pages 66-71; figure 8 * [A] 17,19; | [XDA]EP3546153 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 2,15,16 * paragraphs [0061] - [0101]; figures 1-5 * [A] 17; | [XDAI]EP3546152 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 2,8,15 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 86] - [0100]; figures 1, 3A, 3B, 4 * [A] 4,6 [I] 1,3 | by applicant | WO2018069265 | EP3546153 | EP3546152 |