EP3918902 - PLANT TRIMMING APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eteros Technologies Inc. 202-17665 66A Avenue Surrey, British Columbia V3S 2A7 / CA | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ingram, Erik Abbotsford, British Columbia V2S 2R7 / CA | 02 /
McKellar, Aaron Maple Ridge, British Columbia V2W 1N8 / CA | 03 /
Heywood, Joe New Westminster, British Columbia V3M 3X9 / CA | 04 /
Klossok, Rudi Coquitlam, British Columbia V3J 7C8 / CA | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Düsseldorf Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiserswerther Straße 183 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | CBDL Patentanwälte Königstraße 57 47051 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21188738.5 | 26.10.2018 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | US201715796157 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US201715796157 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918902 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/53, A01D34/74, B02C18/18 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A01G3/00 (EP,IL,US);
A01D34/53 (EP,IL);
A01G17/023 (IL,US);
A01G2003/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHNEIDEN VON PFLANZEN | [2021/49] | English: | PLANT TRIMMING APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2021/49] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE TAILLAGE DE PLANTES | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18869571.2 / EP3700322 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT207162B (WAXENEGGER IGNAZ DIPL ING, et al); | [X]US2006054725 (MATLIN TAI H K [US]); | [X]US2006219827 (MATLIN TAIHOON K [US], et al); | [XI]CN200950762Y (JIANG YUANFA [CN]); | [X]WO2010005948 (FKA DISTRIBUTING DBA HOMEDICS [US], et al); | [X]GB2470260 (FELLOWES INC [US]) |