EP4132045 - INJECTION SYSTEM WITH SIMPLIFIED DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstraße 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urbanek, Leos 3012 Bern / CH | 02 /
Maechler, Silas 3270 Aarberg / CH | 03 /
Mangold, Stefan 3097 Liebefeld / CH | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Meier Obertüfer, Jürg, et al Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21189122.1 | 02.08.2021 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132045 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/03, H04W12/50, A61M5/24, // A61M5/178, H04W84/18, H04B5/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04W12/50 (EP);
A61M5/24 (EP);
H04W12/03 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/6018 (EP);
A61M2205/8212 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSSYSTEM MIT VEREINFACHTER DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/06] | English: | INJECTION SYSTEM WITH SIMPLIFIED DATA TRANSMISSION | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INJECTION À TRANSMISSION SIMPLIFIÉE DE DONNÉES | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 14.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US9022988 (SHABAN KAVAN J [US]) [I] 14 * column 2, line 33 - column 9, line 13 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-13,15; | [A]CH714994 (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH]) [A] 14,15* paragraph [0021] *; | [XI]WO2020176319 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0181] * * figures 1-30 * [I] 1-13,15; | [I]EP3734605 (YPSOMED AG [CH]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-3 * |